Trustees THE NATIONAL GAS MUSEUM TRUST
Charity number: 1072375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Thomas Basigara | Chair | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephen Michael Richardson | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Payne | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEAN BERRY | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
JON BUTTERWORTH MBE | Trustee | 13 December 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr DEREK ANTHONY ROBINSON MA DPHIL | Trustee | 20 July 1999 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRITLAND HORNE MIGASC | Trustee | 23 March 1999 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.