Trustees BROADENING CHOICES FOR OLDER PEOPLE
Charity number: 1074954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Anne Sizer | Chair | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Julie Beachim | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Mark Hall | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peta Susan Mandleberg | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Lindon-Lewis | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Mary Davies | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Gore | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tapshum Pattni | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||
DR NICOLA BRADBURY | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Bennett | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.