Accounts and annual returns BRITISH CARDIOVASCULAR INTERVENTION SOCIETY
Charity number: 1073454
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | 23 August 2011 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 14 July 2010 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 13 July 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 21 July 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 21 July 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 14 August 2008 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 14 August 2008 | 15 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window