Governing document CISV INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/10/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 09/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/08/2015 as amended on 16 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER EDUCATION IN INTERNATIONAL UNDERSTANDING OF CHILDREN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, RELIGION OR POLITICS SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY CONSCIOUS OF THEIR RESPONSIBILITIES AS HUMAN BEINGS TO DEVELOP THE INDIVIDUAL CHILD'S POTENTIAL FOR CO-OPERATION WITH OTHERS TO FURTHER RESEARCH CONTRIBUTING TO THIS WORK
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.