Accounts and annual returns THE LIVERPOOL MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1071951
Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 193 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 June 2022 | 508 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 June 2022 | 508 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 23 June 2021 | 504 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 23 June 2021 | 504 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window