Trustees TAMAR PROTECTION SOCIETY
Charity number: 1080453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Jones | Chair | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Richardson | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
STUART VIVIENNE RAE | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLARE FISHER | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRIGETTE DIXON | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Blair | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Pitkeithly | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Smith | Trustee | 20 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lewis | Trustee | 20 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Lilley | Trustee | 20 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Couch | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Sweet | Trustee | 01 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
BENITA PEDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.