LIVE ART DEVELOPMENT AGENCY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Live Art Development Agency offers a portfolio of resources, opportunities, projects and publishing for the support and development of Live Art practices and discourses in London, the UK and internationally. LADA is committed to working strategically, in partnership, and in consultation with artists and organisations in the cultural sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £240,186 from 1 government grant(s)
People
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Mark Deacon | Chair | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ansuman Biswas | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katy Baird | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHARLES WANSELL | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Wright | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Lloyd | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Angela Bartram | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £447.76k | £455.28k | £357.95k | £273.32k | £252.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £509.39k | £489.81k | £391.49k | £308.77k | £286.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £276.93k | £18.42k | £5.68k | £240.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16TH OCTOBER AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 22ND FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY BY FACILITATING THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE LIVE ART SECTOR IN LONDON
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Garrett Centre
117A Mansford Street
LONDON
E2 6LX
- Phone:
- 02089852124
- Email:
- info@thisisliveart.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window