Trustees HILLCREST RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1073604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Keyworth | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Kay Moore | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Olive Belcher | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Malcom Lee | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH KENWORTHY-BROWNE | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Pomfrett | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE FALKINGHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
CLARE ELIZABETH GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIRGINIA MARGERY CHURCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.