Governing document NORTH WEST ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL RESCUE N.W.E.S.S.R.
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/01/1999 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2004 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2011 as amended on 31 Mar 2019 as amended on 28 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
To promote the welfare and relieve the suffering of the breed of dog known as the English Springer Spaniel who are in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, neglect or such other circumstances as the trustees shall determine, in particular by the provision of facilities for the reception, care and rehoming of such animals.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.