Governing document GURU NANAK PANJABI SCHOOL LEICESTER
Charity number: 1076255
Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26TH MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED ON 22ND JUNE 1996, 3RD JUNE 1999, 17 JUNE 2000 AND 27 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PANJABI LANGUAGE, SIKH HISTORY, RELIGION, AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.