Trustees WYCOMBE WILDLIFE GROUP
Charity number: 1075175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Jeffrey Herschel | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Margaret Thomas | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howard John Bailey | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Denise Hopton | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Osborn | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ROBERTS | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MITCHELL BOWYER | Trustee | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ALAN WILDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ALEXANDER DONALD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.