Accounts and annual returns C AND G FUND LIMITED
Charity number: 1078235
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 171 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 171 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 August 2022 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 17 August 2022 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 19 May 2020 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 19 May 2020 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window