Trustees DEVIZES AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1076852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY CHARLES PALMER | Chair | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Geddes | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Green | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Green | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANGELL TOTTEN | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARGARET THOMSON | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE GARVEN | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVID RALPH SPENS | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY RUTTER | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Houghton | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER FRANKS | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE BULL | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEANNETTE SMITH | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WELLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.