Trustees FRIENDS OF DULVERTON SCHOOL ( FODS )
Charity number: 1077469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luisa Goodyear | Chair | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hillier | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Burwood | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare McGuire | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Tilney | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Edmonds | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Way | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Anne Rooney | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fay Alexandra Chuter | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Bailey | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Henry Chuter | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.