Governing document WORLD OBESITY FEDERATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAY 2016 as amended on 07 Jul 2020 as amended on 07 Jul 2020 as amended on 12 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH BY DEVELOPING A DEEPER UNDERSTANDING OF THE CAUSES OF OBESITY AND ITS PREVENTION AND MANAGEMENT BY HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS, HEALTH RELATED ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENTS AND THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.