Governing document CHILDHOOD CANCER PARENTS ALLIANCE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED ON 29 JANUARY 2000, 7 APRIL 2000, 1 MAY 2000 AND 10 NOVEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION TO THE PUBLIC BY; A) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO CHILDHOOD CANCER AT NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LEVEL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.