Trustees CARLISLE DIOCESE MOTHERS UNION
Charity number: 1078251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Ann Belton | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kay Shepherd | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Wodeman | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deborah Lee | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Gardner | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Simpson | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.