Governing document Lifeline Fund
Charity number: 1080687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2021 as amended on 21 Jan 2022 as amended on 26 Apr 2023 as amended on 19 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE CARE OF CHILDREN AND VULNERABLE ADULTS IN MALAWI.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MALAWI
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.