Trustees METHODIST HOMES
Charity number: 1083995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ANTHONY REILLY | Chair | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Jessica Elizabeth White | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Suganthi Anketell | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Richard Mark Vautrey | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Denise Sanderson-Estcourt | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Lisa Commane | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
KEITH HICKEY | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Rev RUTH GEE | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Martin Burkitt | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Balachandren Muthuvaloe Gnanapragasam | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Cozens OBE | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.