Financial history ST MARYS HOME SCHOOL PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1086761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.48k | £835 | £0 | £1.00k | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | £2.61k | £1.85k | £1.38k | £1.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.