Accounts and annual returns KINGS FOR CHRIST MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1081395
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 141 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 141 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 342 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 342 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window