Trustees ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION WADDINGTON BRANCH
Charity number: 1078943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bailey | Chair | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Betts | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Sedgbeer | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Stanley Dennis | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Diana Doe | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Moya Jancis Dennis | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL DOORBAR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.