Trustees THE INTERNATIONAL ALLIANCE OF ALS / MND ASSOCIATIONS
Charity number: 1079504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calaneet Hadassah Balas | Chair | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Moore | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gethin Thomas | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabine Turgeman | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yohei Yomada | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lung KUO | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilmi Uysal | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcela Santos | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gudjon Sigurdsson | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pablo Agustin Aquino | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.