Trustees EAST COAST TRUCKERS CHARITY
Charity number: 1082023
Charity reporting is up to date (97 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN ALEXANDER MACKIE | Chair | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Warman | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Johnson | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
trevor Howlett | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Hamling | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.