Trustees HILL CLOSE GARDENS TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1085278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Haughton | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cathcart | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wainwright | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harbinder Singh Jhita | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Eddy | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Vivian Bleasdale | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LAMB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE HENRY CHRISTOPHER BEGG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.