Trustees NEWPORT AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1081748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Asson | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Gunn-Russell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Belcher | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clarkson | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maddocks | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Craddock | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT DOBSON | Trustee | 05 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN FORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.