Trustees IRISH COMMUNITY SERVICES
Charity number: 1085033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK ANTHONY FRANCIS BURNS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Vincent | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Cassandra Grice | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eamonn Dillon | Trustee | 22 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark McCormack | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Cotter | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL INGNATIUS EWINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AGNES FORDE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.