Trustees CHURCH IN LONDON - REBUILT CHURCH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT
Charity number: 1087577
Charity reporting is up to date (263 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KUN TSUO | Chair | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Yao-Hung Koo | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Quang | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yu-liang Lee | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE TANG | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN CHIU | Trustee | 17 July 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.