Governing document SANDHURST SILVER BAND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 FEBRUARY 1968 AS AMENDED 8 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAY 2020 as amended on 04 May 2020 as amended on 16 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND PRACTICE OF BRASS BAND MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, ATTENDING COMPETITIONS AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE STUDY AND PLAYING OF BRASS BAND INSTRUMENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BERKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.