Trustees FIRST SPEN VALLEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1084325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN WALTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Vicki Stevens | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Liley | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN DENISE MCKIRGAN | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET CAINE | Trustee | 21 November 2011 |
|
|||||
MR TONY BANNISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.