Dogfen lywodraethu THAMES VALLEY AIR AMBULANCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/08/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/03/2015 as amended on 29 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND INJURY AND THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN LIFE BY:- 3.1.1. THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF AN AIR AMBULANCE SERVICE; AND 3.1.2. THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF OTHER EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES, ANCILLARY TO OR RELATED TO THOSE SET OUT IN OBJECT 3.1.1, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) THE TRAINING OF MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS IN PRE-HOSPITAL CARE; (B) SPECIAL EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES FOR THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND INFANTS IN BERKSHIRE, OXFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Maes buddion
BERKSHIRE, OXFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.