Trustees RADIOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY CONGRESSES
Charity number: 1087939
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Andrew Welton | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Emma Elizabeth Hyde | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Frederick Keevil | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Sara Purdy | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Anthony Peter O'Connor | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Morgan | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EVANS | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|||||
PAMELA LESLEY BLACK | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR JOHN KOTRE | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.