Trustees GESGB
Charity number: 1085619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Bessa | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Twyman | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Laux | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bellingham | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Lake | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Scott | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niall Mark | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Hunt | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Miles | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Leslie Sayers | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Aaron Lockwood | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.