Governing document THE FRIENDS OF POCKLINGTON ARTS CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEB 2001 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2017 as amended on 25 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS PARTICULARLY THE ARTS OF DRAMA MUSIC DANCE AND FILM AND TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF IMPROVED FACILITIES AT OAK HOUSE THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE FRIENDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.