Trustees THE FRIENDS OF POCKLINGTON ARTS CENTRE
Charity number: 1086300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Singh | Chair | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Findlay | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Les Kennedy | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Eldridge | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Anderson | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Iredale | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Knill | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Diane Brader | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.