Trustees THE SELSDON CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 1087131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS BONNEYWELL | Chair | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Alan Stotten | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Ruth Phillips | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Wendy Lorraine Crayford | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Lumiste | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Sinclair KC | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Crayford | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev YOUNIS FRANCIS | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Tilley | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Pullen | Trustee | 16 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BROOKES | Trustee | 01 August 2003 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.