Governing document SILVERWOOD SCHOOL CHARITY TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 29 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 200, 06 MAY 2003 AND 01 NOVEMBER 2006 as amended on 30 Nov 2021 as amended on 04 May 2022 as amended on 22 May 2023 as amended on 22 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT SILVERWOOD SCHOOL IN WILTSHIRE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.