Trustees SILVERWOOD SCHOOL CHARITY TRUST
Charity number: 1088605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Col. Tim Symonds | Chair | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Parker | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Bates | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MILLEr | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Gordon Scorer | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Jason Card | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GORDON FRY | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL DAVID PATTERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGGIE MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE BOWDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.