Governing document NEW PHILANTHROPY CAPITAL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 JULY 2001, 21 MARCH 2002, 9 JULY 2003, 21 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 3 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
1) TO IMPROVE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY EVALUATING THE GOVERNANCE OF PARTICULAR CHARITIES OR A RANGE OF CHARITIES AND THE IMPACT OF THEIR ACTIVITIES 2) TO ADVANCE ALL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER ENGLISH LAW
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.