Governing document THE QUINBORNE CHOIR
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 1939 AS AMENDED 7 MARCH 1990, 25 JULY 2001, 24 OCTOBER 2001 AND 30 JANUARY 2002 as amended on 25 Jan 2023 as amended on 25 Jan 2023 as amended on 25 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity shall be: 1. to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public events.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.