Accounts and annual returns SAPS (SCIENCE AND PLANTS FOR SCHOOLS)
Charity number: 1089475
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 12 February 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 21 February 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 20 February 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 19 February 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 21 February 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 20 April 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 21 December 2005 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 10 March 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 24 January 2005 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window