Trustees THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETIES
Charity number: 1089743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Woods | Chair | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Ward | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stuart Timothy Ward | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Coleman | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Traylen Taylor | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elisabeth Watson | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Strachan | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Marie Trevor-Jones | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Constance Harding-Edgar | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.