Accounts and annual returns CLEVEDON UNITED JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1122841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 December 2021 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 December 2021 | 221 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 07 December 2021 | 586 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 07 December 2021 | 586 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window