Governing document EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF THORACIC SURGEONS
Charity number: 1094888
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/10/2000 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2005 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND PATIENT CARE BY THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THORACIC SURGERY AND RELATED MEDICAL SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.