Trustees RUSHMOOR CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Charity number: 1090669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Woolley | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nealum Dehal | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Raine | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Cooper | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Uma Indran | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Levey | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Austin | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Bennett | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jason Halliday | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Levey | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.