Accounts and annual returns BEDWADE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1091169
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 08 July 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 31 August 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 30 August 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 01 March 2007 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 26 November 2004 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window