Trustees THE HIGH LANE U3A
Charity number: 1091296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Neillands | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Daphne Cooke | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Wareham | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Arnold | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dale | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
barbara kenneth | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andre Lister | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diane Saxon | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Birks | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Pam Curley | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Trevor Kinvig | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KENNETH | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GRACE HARLIN | Trustee | 09 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 13 February 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.