Governance WELWYN HATFIELD ACTION ON DISABILITY (WHAD)
Charity number: 1093984
Charity reporting is overdue by 535 days
Registration history:
- 01 October 2002: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 October 2011: Re-registered
- 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 November 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.