Trustees THE HARTLEPOOL MASONIC BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1094037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Maw Mr | Chair | 26 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Jamie Allison | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Ratcliffe MBE | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kris Middleton | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Fryer | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN HEWETSON | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM VINCENT FLORENTINE | Trustee | 26 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
LEWIS JOHN AYERS | Trustee | 26 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.