Trustees WETHERBY IN BLOOM
Charity number: 1094260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jan Cooper | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET DABELL | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Pickard | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Walker | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike O'Sullivan | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Nicholas Fossey | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY TURNER | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ELIZABETH DUNCAN | Trustee | 23 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MCLEAN | Trustee | 23 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE DRINKALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.